Nevada Vision Stakeholder Group

Meetings

Friday, September 10, 2010 9:00 AM

This is the eleventh and final meeting of the 2009-2010 Interim. Please agenda with attached "Executive Summary" for details.

Location(s)

  • Room 4412 of the Grant Sawyer State Office Building, 555 E. Washington Ave., Las Vegas, NV.
  • Videoconferenced to Room 2134 of the Legislative Building, 401 S. Carson St., Carson City, NV.


Friday, August 6, 2010 9:00 AM

This is the tenth meeting of the 2009-2010 Interim. Please see agenda for details.

Location(s)

  • Room 4412 of the Grant Sawyer State Office Building, 555 E. Washington Ave., Las Vegas, NV.
  • Videoconferenced to Room 2134 of the Legislative Building, 401 S. Carson St., Carson City, NV.


Friday, May 14, 2010 9:00 AM

This is the ninth meeting of the 2009-2010 Interim. **PRIMARY MEETING LOCATION CHANGED** **ROOM CHANGED** Please see agenda for details.

Location(s)

  • Room 4412 of the Grant Sawyer State Office Building, 555 E. Washington Ave., Las Vegas, NV.
  • Videoconferenced to Room 4100 of the Legislative Building, 401 S. Carson St., Carson City, NV.


Wednesday, April 21, 2010 9:00 AM

This is the eighth meeting of the 2009-2010 Interim. **ROOM CHANGED** Please see agenda for details.

Location(s)

  • Room 4412 of the Grant Sawyer State Office Building, 555 E. Washington Ave., Las Vegas, NV.
  • Videoconferenced to Room 2134 of the Legislative Building, 401 S. Carson St., Carson City, NV.


Tuesday, April 6, 2010 9:00 AM

This is the seventh meeting of the 2009-2010 Interim. Please see agenda for details.

Location(s)

  • Room 4412 of the Grant Sawyer State Office Building, 555 E. Washington Ave., Las Vegas, NV.
  • Videoconferenced to Room 2134 of the Legislative Building, 401 S. Carson St., Carson City, NV.


Monday, March 22, 2010 9:00 AM

This is the sixth meeting of the 2009-2010 Interim. Please see agenda for details.

Location(s)

  • Room 4401 of the Grant Sawyer State Office Building, 555 E. Washington Ave., Las Vegas, NV.
  • Videoconferenced to Room 2134 of the Legislative Building, 401 S. Carson St., Carson City, NV.


Friday, March 12, 2010 9:00 AM

This is the fifth meeting of the 2009-2010 Interim. Please see agenda for details.

Location(s)

  • Room 4401 of the Grant Sawyer State Office Building, 555 E. Washington Ave., Las Vegas, NV.
  • Videoconferenced to Room 2135 of the Legislative Building, 401 S. Carson St., Carson City, NV.


Thursday, February 25, 2010 9:00 AM

This is the fourth meeting of the 2009-2010 Interim. Please see agenda for details.

Location(s)

  • Room 4401 of the Grant Sawyer State Office Building, 555 E. Washington Ave., Las Vegas, NV.
  • Videoconferenced to Room 2134 of the Legislative Building, 401 S. Carson St., Carson City, NV.


Thursday, February 11, 2010 9:00 AM

This is the third meeting of the 2009-2010 Interim. Please see agenda for details.

Location(s)

  • Room 4401 of the Grant Sawyer State Office Building, 555 E. Washington Ave., Las Vegas, NV.
  • Videoconferenced to Room 2134 of the Legislative Building, 401 S. Carson St., Carson City, NV.


Friday, January 29, 2010 9:00 AM

This is the second meeting of the 2009-2010 Interim. Please see agenda for details.

Location(s)

  • Room 4401 of the Grant Sawyer State Office Building, 555 E. Washington Ave., Las Vegas, NV.
  • Videoconferenced to Room 2134 of the Legislative Building, 401 S. Carson St., Carson City, NV.


Friday, January 8, 2010 9:00 AM

This is the first meeting of the 2009-2010 Interim. ** AGENDA REVISED** Please see revised agenda for details.

Location(s)

  • Room 4401 of the Grant Sawyer State Office Building, 555 E. Washington Ave., Las Vegas, NV.
  • Videoconferenced to Room 2134 of the Legislative Building, 401 S. Carson St., Carson City, NV.