Legislative Committee on Senior Citizens, Veterans and Adults with Special Needs (NRS 218E.750)

Meetings

Tuesday, June 15, 2010 9:00 AM

This is the fourth meeting of the 2009-2010 Interim and the Committee's work session. Please see agenda with attached "Work Session Document" for details.

Location(s)

  • Room 4401 of the Grant Sawyer State Office Building, 555 E. Washington Ave., Las Vegas, NV.
  • Videoconferenced to Room 2135 of the Legislative Building, 401 S. Carson St., Carson City, NV.


Tuesday, April 13, 2010 9:00 AM

This is the third meeting of the 2009-2010 Interim. Please see agenda for details.

Location(s)

  • Room 4401 of the Grant Sawyer State Office Building, 555 E. Washington Ave., Las Vegas, NV.
  • Videoconferenced to Room 2135 of the Legislative Building, 401 S. Carson St., Carson City, NV.


Wednesday, March 10, 2010 9:00 AM

This is the second meeting of the 2009-2010 Interim. Meeting rescheduled from March 2, 2010. Please see agenda for details.

Location(s)

  • Room 4401 of the Grant Sawyer State Office Building, 555 E. Washington Ave., Las Vegas, NV.
  • Videoconferenced to Room 3137 of the Legislative Building, 401 S. Carson St., Carson City, NV.



Wednesday, January 20, 2010 9:00 AM

This is the first meeting of the 2009-2010 Interim. Please see agenda for details.

Location(s)

  • Room 4401 of the Grant Sawyer State Office Building, 555 E. Washington Ave., Las Vegas, NV.
  • Videoconferenced to Room 2135 of the Legislative Building, 401 S. Carson St., Carson City, NV.