Joint Interim Standing Committee on Natural Resources

Meetings

Monday, August 22, 2022 10:30 AM

This is the fifth meeting of the 2021-2022 Interim. **TIME CHANGED** Please see the agenda and "Work Session Document" for details.

Location(s)

  • Room 4401 of the Grant Sawyer State Office Building, 555 East Washington Avenue, Las Vegas, NV.
  • Videoconferenced to Room 3138 of the Legislative Building, 401 South Carson Street, Carson City, NV.


Thursday, June 16, 2022 9:00 AM

Please see the agenda for details.

Location(s)

  • Room 4401 of the Grant Sawyer State Office Building, 555 East Washington Avenue, Las Vegas, NV.
  • Videoconferenced to Room 4100 of the Legislative Building, 401 South Carson Street, Carson City, NV.


Monday, March 21, 2022 9:30 AM

This is the third meeting of the 2021-2022 Interim. Please see agenda for details.

Location(s)

  • Room 4401 of the Grant Sawyer State Office Building, 555 East Washington Avenue, Las Vegas, NV.
  • Videoconferenced to Room 3138 of the Legislative Building, 401 South Carson Street, Carson City, NV.


Monday, February 28, 2022 9:30 AM

This is the second meeting of the 2021-2022 Interim. Please see the agenda for details.

Location(s)

  • Off-site


Friday, January 21, 2022 9:30 AM

This is the first meeting of the 2021-2022 Interim. Please see the agenda for details.

Location(s)

  • Off-site