Legislative Committee on Child Welfare and Juvenile Justice (NRS 218E.705)
Meetings
Friday, October 23, 2020 9:00 AM
This is the sixth and final meeting of the 2019-2020 Interim and the Committee's work session. Please see the agenda and Work Session Document for details.
Location(s)
- Off-site
Monday, September 28, 2020 9:00 AM
This is the fifth meeting of the 2019-2020 Interim. Please see agenda for details.
Location(s)
- Off-site
Friday, August 28, 2020 9:00 AM
This is the fourth meeting of the 2019-2020 Interim. Please see the revised agenda for details.
Location(s)
- Off-site
Friday, June 19, 2020 9:00 AM
This is the third meeting of the 2019-2020 Interim. Please see agenda for details.
Location(s)
- Off-site
Friday, February 14, 2020 9:00 AM
This is the second meeting of the 2019-2020 Interim. Meeting rescheduled from January 24, 2020. Please see agenda for details.
Location(s)
- Room 4401 of the Grant Sawyer State Office Building, 555 East Washington Avenue, Las Vegas, NV.
- Videoconferenced to Room 3138 of the Legislative Building, 401 South Carson Street, Carson City, NV.
Thursday, December 12, 2019 9:00 AM
This is the first meeting of the 2019-2020 Interim. Please see agenda for details.
Location(s)
- Room 4401 of the Grant Sawyer State Office Building, 555 East Washington Avenue, Las Vegas, NV.
- Videoconferenced to Room 3138 of the Legislative Building, 401 South Carson Street, Carson City, NV.