Legislative Commission's Budget Subcommittee (NRS 218E.255)

Meetings

Thursday, January 31, 2019 8:30 AM

This is the sixth meeting in calendar year 2019. Please see agenda for details.

Location(s)

  • Room 4100 of the Legislative Building, 401 South Carson Street, Carson City, NV.
  • Videoconferenced to Room 4401 of the Grant Sawyer State Office Building, 555 East Washington Avenue, Las Vegas, NV.


Wednesday, January 30, 2019 8:30 AM

This is the fifth meeting in calendar year 2019. Please see agenda for details.

Location(s)

  • Room 4100 of the Legislative Building, 401 South Carson Street, Carson City, NV.
  • Videoconferenced to Room 4401 of the Grant Sawyer State Office Building, 555 East Washington Avenue, Las Vegas, NV.


Tuesday, January 29, 2019 8:30 AM

This is the fourth meeting in calendar year 2019. Please see agenda for details.

Location(s)

  • Room 4100 of the Legislative Building, 401 South Carson Street, Carson City, NV.
  • Videoconferenced to Room 4401 of the Grant Sawyer State Office Building, 555 East Washington Avenue, Las Vegas, NV.


Thursday, January 24, 2019 8:30 AM

This is the third meeting in calendar year 2019. Please see agenda for details.

Location(s)

  • Room 4100 of the Legislative Building, 401 South Carson Street, Carson City, NV.
  • Videoconferenced to Room 4401 of the Grant Sawyer State Office Building, 555 East Washington Avenue, Las Vegas, NV.


Wednesday, January 23, 2019 8:30 AM

This is the second meeting in calendar year 2019. Please see agenda for details.

Location(s)

  • Room 4100 of the Legislative Building, 401 South Carson Street, Carson City, NV.
  • Videoconferenced to Room 4401 of the Grant Sawyer State Office Building, 555 East Washington Avenue, Las Vegas, NV.


Tuesday, January 22, 2019 8:30 AM

This is the first meeting in calendar year 2019. Please see agenda for details.

Location(s)

  • Room 4100 of the Legislative Building, 401 South Carson Street, Carson City, NV.
  • Videoconferenced to Room 4401 of the Grant Sawyer State Office Building, 555 East Washington Avenue, Las Vegas, NV.