Study of Suicide Prevention

Meetings

Friday, August 16, 2002 10:00 AM

This is the Fifth of the 2003 - 2002 interim

Location(s)

  • Room 3138 of the Legislative Building, 401 S. Carson St., Carson City, NV
  • Videoconferenced to Room 4401 of the Grant Sawyer State Office Building, 555 East Washington Ave., Las Vegas, NV


Friday, May 24, 2002 8:30 AM

This is the Fourth of the 2003 - 2002 interim

Location(s)

  • Room 4401 of the Grant Sawyer State Office Building, 555 East Washington Ave., Las Vegas, NV
  • Videoconferenced to Room 3138 of the Legislative Building, 401 S. Carson St., Carson City, NV


Friday, March 22, 2002 10:00 AM

This is the Third of the 2003 - 2002 interim

Location(s)

  • Washoe County Commission Chambers, 1001 East Ninth Street, Building A, Reno, NV


Friday, February 1, 2002 10:00 AM

This is the Second of the 2003 - 2002 interim

Location(s)

  • Room 3138 of the Legislative Building, 401 S. Carson St., Carson City, NV
  • Room 4401 of the Grant Sawyer State Office Building, 555 East Washington Ave., Las Vegas, NV


Friday, November 9, 2001 9:30 AM

This is the First of the 2003 - 2002 interim

Location(s)

  • Room 4401 of the Grant Sawyer State Office Building, 555 East Washington Ave., Las Vegas, NV
  • Room 3138 of the Legislative Building, 401 S. Carson St., Carson City, NV