Legislative Committee on Public Lands-Wilderness and Wilderness Study Areas Subcommittee

Meetings

Monday, October 7, 2002 9:30 AM

This is the Fifth of the 2003 - 2002 interim

Location(s)

  • Room 4100 of the Legislative Building, 401 S. Carson St., Carson City, NV
  • Videoconferenced to Room 4412 of the Grant Sawyer State Office Building, 555 East Washington Ave., Las Vegas, NV


Friday, May 3, 2002 9:00 AM

This is the Fourth of the 2003 - 2002 interim

Location(s)

  • Bristlecone Convention Center 150 Sixth Street Ely, Nevada


Thursday, March 7, 2002 9:00 AM

This is the Third of the 2003 - 2002 interim

Location(s)

  • Reno City Council Chambers, 490 South Center St., Reno, NV


Friday, February 15, 2002 8:30 AM

This is the Second of the 2003 - 2002 interim

Location(s)

  • Nye County Board of Commissioners Chambers, 101 Radar Road, Tonopah, NV


Monday, November 19, 2001 8:30 AM

This is the First of the 2003 - 2002 interim

Location(s)

  • Room 4401 of the Grant Sawyer State Office Building, 555 East Washington Ave., Las Vegas, NV
  • Videoconferenced to Room 3137 of the Legislative Building, 401 S. Carson St., Carson City, NV