Nevada Electronic Legislative Information System

Daily Schedule for Friday, May 9, 2025


Agenda
  • Room 3143 of the Legislative Building, 401 South Carson Street, Carson City, NV.
  • Videoconferenced to Room 1 of the Nevada Legislature Hearing Rooms, 7120 Amigo Street, Las Vegas, NV.

Agenda
  • Room 3138 of the Legislative Building, 401 South Carson Street, Carson City, NV.
  • Videoconferenced to Room 3 of the Nevada Legislature Hearing Rooms, 7120 Amigo Street, Las Vegas, NV.

Agenda
  • Room 4100 of the Legislative Building, 401 South Carson Street, Carson City, NV.
  • Videoconferenced to Room 6 of the Nevada Legislature Hearing Rooms, 7120 Amigo Street, Las Vegas, NV.

Agenda
  • Room 2134 of the Legislative Building, 401 South Carson Street, Carson City, NV.
  • Videoconferenced to Room 5 of the Nevada Legislature Hearing Rooms, 7120 Amigo Street, Las Vegas, NV.

Agenda
  • Room 3137 of the Legislative Building, 401 South Carson Street, Carson City, NV.
  • Videoconferenced to Room 2 of the Nevada Legislature Hearing Rooms, 7120 Amigo Street, Las Vegas, NV.

Agenda
  • Room 1214 of the Legislative Building, 401 South Carson Street, Carson City, NV.
  • Videoconferenced to Room 6 of the Nevada Legislature Hearing Rooms, 7120 Amigo Street, Las Vegas, NV.

Agenda
  • Room 4100 of the Legislative Building, 401 South Carson Street, Carson City, NV.
  • Videoconferenced to Room 1 of the Nevada Legislature Hearing Rooms, 7120 Amigo Street, Las Vegas, NV.

Agenda
  • Room 3138 of the Legislative Building, 401 South Carson Street, Carson City, NV.
  • Videoconferenced to Room 3 of the Nevada Legislature Hearing Rooms, 7120 Amigo Street, Las Vegas, NV.

Agenda
  • Room 2134 of the Legislative Building, 401 South Carson Street, Carson City, NV.
  • Videoconferenced to Room 7 of the Nevada Legislature Hearing Rooms, 7120 Amigo Street, Las Vegas, NV.

Agenda
  • Room 2149 of the Legislative Building, 401 South Carson Street, Carson City, NV.
  • Videoconferenced to Room 8 of the Nevada Legislature Hearing Rooms, 7120 Amigo Street, Las Vegas, NV.

Agenda
  • Room 2144 of the Legislative Building, 401 South Carson Street, Carson City, NV.

Upcoming Floor Sessions



Monday, May 12, 2025

Upcoming Deadlines


Friday, May 16, 2025
Committee Passage (Second House)
Saturday, May 17, 2025
Finish Budget Differences
Friday, May 23, 2025
Second House Passage
Wednesday, May 28, 2025
Budget Bills Introduced and Exempt Bills from Committee
Back to top