Administrative Regulation Notices

Meetings and Workshops

NRS 233B.0601 (Added by AB 252 of the 77th (2013) Session)
Today is Monday, May 12, 2025

05/14/2025    9:00AM
Meeting Notice
Nevada Funeral & Cemetery Services Board
Notice of Intent to Act on a Regulation NAC451/R142-23
3740 Lakeside Drive, Suite 201, Reno, Nevada
05/14/2025    9:00AM
Meeting Notice
Nevada State Board of Education
Public Hearing
Nevada Department of Education Offices, 700 East Fifth Street, Board Room, Carson City and 2080 East Flamingo Road, Room 114, Las Vegas, Nevada.
05/21/2025    9:30AM
Meeting Notice
NEVADA TAXICAB AUTHORITY
NOTICE OF INTENT TO ACT UPON REGULATIONS and PUBLIC HEARING TO ADOPT TEMPORARY REGULATIONS/TEMPORARILY AMEND REGULATIONS/ TEMPORARILY REPEAL REGULATIONS FROM CHAPTER 706 (NEVADA TAXICAB AUTHORITY) OF THE NEVADA ADMINISTRATIVE CODE
Nevada State Business Center, 3300 W. Sahara Avenue, Suite 400 Nevada Room, Las Vegas, Nevada 89102
05/21/2025    9:30AM
Meeting Notice
NEVADA TAXICAB AUTHORITY
NOTICE OF INTENT TO ACT UPON REGULATIONS and PUBLIC HEARING TO ADOPT TEMPORARY REGULATIONS/TEMPORARILY AMEND REGULATIONS/ TEMPORARILY REPEAL REGULATIONS FROM CHAPTER 706 (NEVADA TAXICAB AUTHORITY) OF THE NEVADA ADMINISTRATIVE CODE
Nevada State Business Center, 3300 W. Sahara Avenue, Suite 400 Nevada Room, Las Vegas, Nevada 89102
05/21/2025    9:30AM
Meeting Notice
NEVADA TAXICAB AUTHORITY
NOTICE OF INTENT TO ACT UPON REGULATIONS and PUBLIC HEARING TO ADOPT TEMPORARY REGULATIONS/TEMPORARILY AMEND REGULATIONS/ TEMPORARILY REPEAL REGULATIONS FROM CHAPTER 706 (NEVADA TAXICAB AUTHORITY) OF THE NEVADA ADMINISTRATIVE CODE
Nevada State Business Center, 3300 W. Sahara Avenue, Suite 400 Nevada Room, Las Vegas, Nevada 89102
05/21/2025    9:30AM
Meeting Notice
NEVADA TAXICAB AUTHORITY
NOTICE OF INTENT TO ACT UPON REGULATIONS and PUBLIC HEARING TO ADOPT TEMPORARY REGULATIONS/TEMPORARILY AMEND REGULATIONS/ TEMPORARILY REPEAL REGULATIONS FROM CHAPTER 706 (NEVADA TAXICAB AUTHORITY) OF THE NEVADA ADMINISTRATIVE CODE
Nevada State Business Center, 3300 W. Sahara Avenue, Suite 400 Nevada Room, Las Vegas, Nevada 89102
05/28/2025    9:00AM
Meeting Notice
Nevada State Environmental Commission
State Environmental Commission Regulatory Meeting
Bryan Building, First Floor, Bonnie B. Bryan Conference Room - 901 South Stewart Street, Carson City, Nevada VIRTUAL PARTICIPATION through Teams - see SEC website for link
06/05/2025    2:00PM
Meeting Notice
Nevada Division of Environmental Protection
Notice of Public Workshop Proposed Regulation Revisions SEC File - P2025-01 Bureau of Safe Drinking Water
City of Elko’s Council Chambers 1751 College Avenue Elko, NV 89801
06/10/2025    9:00AM
Meeting Notice
Nevada Division of Environmental Protection
Notice of Public Workshop Proposed Regulation Revisions SEC File - P2025-01 Bureau of Safe Drinking Water
Bryan Building, First Floor, Bonnie B. Bryan Conference Room - 901 South Stewart Street, Carson City, Nevada
06/11/2025    9:00AM
Meeting Notice
Nevada Division of Environmental Protection
Notice of Public Workshop Proposed Regulation Revisions SEC File - P2025-01 Bureau of Safe Drinking Water
Spaghetti Bowl Conference Room - Las Vegas Office 4615 West Sunset Rd. Las Vegas, NV 89118
06/12/2025    9:45AM
Meeting Notice
Nevada State Board of Professional Engineers and Land Surveyors
Notice of Public Hearing Intent to Act Upon Regulations
virtual via zoom and 1755 E Plumb Lane, Suite 258, Reno, NV 89502