Introduced in the Senate on Nov 14, 2018.

Sponsored By: Judiciary Primary

Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action: (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings
None scheduled
Past Hearings
Committee Date Time Agenda Minutes Action
Senate Judiciary Feb 19, 2019 08:00 AM Agenda Minutes Heard, No Action
Final Passage Votes
This bill has not been voted on
Bill/Amendment Text
Bill Text
As Introduced
Bill History
Date Action Journal
Nov 14, 2018 Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.
  Loading...
Nov 15, 2018 From printer.
  Loading...
Feb 04, 2019 Read first time. To committee.
  Loading...
Apr 13, 2019 (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)
  Loading...