Introduced in the Senate on Nov 14, 2018.

Sponsored By: Judiciary Primary

Fiscal Notes (View Fiscal Notes)
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action: (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings
None scheduled
Past Hearings
Committee Date Time Agenda Minutes Action
Senate Judiciary Mar 18, 2019 08:00 AM Agenda Minutes Heard, No Action
Senate Judiciary Mar 22, 2019 08:00 AM Agenda Minutes Amend, and do pass as amended
Assembly Judiciary Apr 30, 2019 08:00 AM Agenda Minutes Heard
Final Passage Votes
House Reprint Date Yea Nay Excused Not Voting Absent
Senate Final Passage (1st Reprint)    Apr 16, 2019 21 0 0 0 0
Bill/Amendment Text
Adopted Amendments
Amend. No. 76   
Bill History
Date Action Journal
Nov 14, 2018 Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.
  Loading...
Nov 15, 2018 From printer.
  Loading...
Feb 04, 2019 Read first time. To committee.
  Loading...
Apr 15, 2019 From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Placed on Second Reading File. Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 76.) To printer.
  Loading...
Apr 16, 2019 From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
  Loading...
Apr 17, 2019 In Assembly. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
  Loading...
May 18, 2019 (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)
  Loading...