Introduced in the Assembly on Nov 16, 2018.

Sponsored By: Judiciary Primary

DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes (View Fiscal Notes)
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action: (No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings
None scheduled
Past Hearings
None
Final Passage Votes
This bill has not been voted on
Bill/Amendment Text
Bill Text
As Introduced
Bill History
Date Action Journal
Nov 16, 2018 Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.
  Loading...
Nov 20, 2018 From printer.
  Loading...
Feb 04, 2019 Read first time. To committee.
  Loading...
Feb 22, 2019 Withdrawn from committee. Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.
  Loading...
Feb 25, 2019 Notice of exemption.
  Loading...
Jun 04, 2019 (No further action taken.)
  Loading...