Introduced in the Assembly on Nov 15, 2018.

Sponsored By: Judiciary Primary

DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes (View Fiscal Notes)
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action: (No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings
None scheduled
Past Hearings
Committee Date Time Agenda Minutes Action
Assembly Judiciary Mar 27, 2019 08:00 AM Agenda Minutes Heard
Assembly Judiciary Apr 11, 2019 08:00 AM Agenda Minutes Amend, and do pass as amended
Final Passage Votes
This bill has not been voted on
Bill/Amendment Text
Adopted Amendments
Amend. No. 297   
Bill History
Date Action Journal
Nov 15, 2018 Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.
  Loading...
Nov 18, 2018 From printer.
  Loading...
Feb 04, 2019 Read first time. To committee.
  Loading...
Feb 25, 2019 Notice of eligibility for exemption.
  Loading...
Apr 19, 2019 From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  Loading...
Apr 22, 2019 Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 297.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To printer.
  Loading...
Apr 23, 2019 From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee.
  Loading...
Jun 04, 2019 (No further action taken.)
  Loading...