SJR11 | View Bill in NELIS |
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 27, 2017. | |
By:
(Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship) Woodhouse, Segerblom, Ford, Farley, Parks, Denis, Spearman |
|
Proposes to amend the Nevada Constitution to revise provisions relating to the State Legislature. (BDR C-1082) |
|
DECLARED EXEMPT | |
Fiscal Notes View Fiscal Notes |
|
Effect on Local Government: No. Effect on State: Yes. |
Most Recent History Action: (See full list below) |
(No further action taken.) |
Upcoming Hearings |
Past Hearings |
||||
Senate Legislative Operations and Elections | May 01, 2017 03:30 PM | Agenda | Minutes | Heard, No Action |
Senate Legislative Operations and Elections | May 08, 2017 03:30 PM | Agenda | Minutes | Amend, and do pass as amended |
Assembly Legislative Operations and Elections | May 25, 2017 01:30 PM | Agenda | Minutes | Heard |
Final Passage Votes | |||||||
Senate Final Passage | (1st Reprint) | May 17, 2017 | Yea 12, | Nay 9, | Excused 0, | Not Voting 0, | Absent 0 |
Bill Text | As Introduced 1st Reprint |
Adopted Amendments | Amend. No. 655 |
Bill History |
|
|
|
|
|
|
|