Bill History |
Mar 27, 2017
|
-
Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.
|
Mar 29, 2017
|
-
From printer. To committee.
|
Apr 04, 2017
|
|
Jun 02, 2017
|
-
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
-
Placed on Second Reading File.
-
Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 921.) To printer.
|
Jun 03, 2017
|
-
From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed.
First reprint
.
-
Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended.
(Yeas: 21, Nays: None.)
To Assembly.
-
In Assembly.
-
Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.
|
Jun 04, 2017
|
-
From committee: Do pass.
-
Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
-
Read third time. Passed. Title approved.
(Yeas: 40, Nays: 2.)
To Senate.
|
Jun 05, 2017
|
-
In Senate. To enrollment.
|
Jun 08, 2017
|
-
Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
|
Jun 09, 2017
|
-
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 528.
|
Effective July 1, 2017.
|