Bill History |
Nov 16, 2016
|
-
Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.
|
Nov 21, 2016
|
|
Feb 06, 2017
|
-
Read first time. To committee.
|
Apr 10, 2017
|
-
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
|
Apr 11, 2017
|
-
Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 39.) To printer.
|
Apr 12, 2017
|
-
From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed.
First reprint
.
-
Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
|
Apr 13, 2017
|
-
Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
|
Apr 14, 2017
|
-
Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
|
Apr 17, 2017
|
|
Apr 18, 2017
|
-
In Senate.
-
Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
|
May 08, 2017
|
|
May 09, 2017
|
|
May 11, 2017
|
|
May 15, 2017
|
-
In Assembly. To enrollment.
|
May 17, 2017
|
-
Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
|
May 22, 2017
|
-
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 69.
|
Effective October 1, 2017.
|