Bill History |
Mar 27, 2017
|
-
Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer.
|
Mar 28, 2017
|
-
From printer. To committee.
|
Apr 24, 2017
|
-
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
-
Placed on Second Reading File.
-
Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 523.) To printer.
|
Apr 25, 2017
|
|
Apr 26, 2017
|
-
In Senate.
-
Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee.
|
May 22, 2017
|
-
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
-
Placed on Second Reading File.
-
Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 806.) To printer.
|
May 23, 2017
|
-
From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed.
Second reprint
.
-
Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk.
|
May 24, 2017
|
-
Taken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File.
-
Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 907.)
-
Reprinting dispensed with.
-
Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved.
(Yeas: 12, Nays: 9.)
-
To printer.
|
May 25, 2017
|
-
From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed.
Third reprint
. To Assembly.
-
In Assembly.
|
May 29, 2017
|
-
Senate Amendment Nos. 806 and 907 concurred in. To enrollment.
|
May 30, 2017
|
-
Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
|
Jun 04, 2017
|
-
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 348.
|
Effective October 1, 2017.
|