Introduced
in the Assembly
on Mar 20, 2017.
|
|
By:
(Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Daly, Frierson, Diaz, Benitez-Thompson, Araujo, Brooks, Carrillo, McCurdy II, Monroe-Moreno
|
Revises various provisions relating to governmental administration. (BDR 18-573) |
DECLARED EXEMPT |
Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
|
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.
|
Bill History |
Mar 20, 2017
|
-
Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer.
|
Mar 22, 2017
|
-
From printer. To committee.
|
Apr 24, 2017
|
-
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
-
Placed on Second Reading File.
-
Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 522.) To printer.
|
Apr 25, 2017
|
|
Apr 26, 2017
|
-
In Senate.
-
Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee.
|
May 24, 2017
|
-
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
-
Placed on Second Reading File.
-
Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 805.) To printer.
|
May 25, 2017
|
-
From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed.
Second reprint
.
-
Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk.
|
May 26, 2017
|
|
Jun 02, 2017
|
-
Taken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File.
-
Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 968.)
-
Reprinting dispensed with.
-
Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended.
(Yeas: 12, Nays: 9.)
-
To printer.
-
From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed.
Third reprint
. To Assembly.
-
In Assembly.
|
Jun 05, 2017
|
-
Senate Amendment Nos. 805 and 968 concurred in. To enrollment.
|
Jun 08, 2017
|
-
Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
-
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
Return to 2019 Session.
|