Bill History |
Mar 20, 2017
|
-
Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer.
|
Mar 22, 2017
|
-
From printer. To committee.
|
Mar 23, 2017
|
|
Jun 01, 2017
|
-
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
-
Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
-
Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 999.)
-
Dispensed with reprinting.
-
Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended.
(Yeas: 39, Nays: None, Excused: 3.)
-
To printer.
-
From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed.
First reprint
.
-
To Senate.
-
In Senate.
-
Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources. To committee.
|
Jun 02, 2017
|
-
From committee: Do pass.
-
Placed on Second Reading File.
-
Read second time.
|
Jun 03, 2017
|
|
Jun 04, 2017
|
-
In Assembly. To enrollment.
|
Jun 05, 2017
|
-
Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
|
Jun 13, 2017
|
-
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 574.
|
Effective July 1, 2017.
|