AB362 | View Bill in NELIS |
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 20, 2017. | |
By:
(Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship) Tolles, Watkins, Benitez-Thompson, Diaz, Krasner, Monroe-Moreno, Oscarson, Pickard, Wheeler, Woodbury, Yeager, Denis, Ford, Gansert, Gustavson, Hammond, Harris, Segerblom, Spearman, Woodhouse |
|
Revises provisions relating to educational personnel. (BDR 34-1144) |
|
DECLARED EXEMPT | |
Fiscal Notes View Fiscal Notes |
|
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact. Effect on State: No. |
|
CONTAINS UNFUNDED MANDATE |
Most Recent History Action: (See full list below) |
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 556. |
Upcoming Hearings |
Past Hearings |
||||
Assembly Judiciary | Apr 10, 2017 08:00 AM | Agenda | Minutes | Heard |
Assembly Judiciary | Apr 14, 2017 See Agenda | Agenda | Minutes | Amend, and do pass as amended |
Assembly Ways and Means | May 01, 2017 08:00 AM | Agenda | Minutes | Heard |
Assembly Ways and Means | May 26, 2017 08:00 AM | Agenda | Minutes | Do pass, as amended |
Senate Education | May 30, 2017 See Agenda | Agenda | Minutes | Amend, and do pass as amended |
Assembly Education | May 31, 2017 03:15 PM | Agenda | Minutes | Mentioned no jurisdiction |
Final Passage Votes | |||||||
Assembly Final Passage | (1st Reprint) | May 26, 2017 | Yea 41, | Nay 0, | Excused 1, | Not Voting 0, | Absent 0 |
Senate Final Passage | (3rd Reprint) | Jun 03, 2017 | Yea 21, | Nay 0, | Excused 0, | Not Voting 0, | Absent 0 |
Senate Reconsideration | (3rd Reprint) | Jun 03, 2017 | Yea 21, | Nay 0, | Excused 0, | Not Voting 0, | Absent 0 |
Bill Text | As Introduced 1st Reprint 2nd Reprint 3rd Reprint As Enrolled |
Proposed Amendments | Amend. No. 1070 |
Adopted Amendments | Amend. No. 603 Amend. No. 1049 Amend. No. 1124 |
Bill History |
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
Effective July 1, 2017. |