Bill History |
Mar 20, 2017
|
-
Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.
|
Mar 21, 2017
|
-
From printer. To committee.
|
Apr 24, 2017
|
-
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
-
Placed on Second Reading File.
-
Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 272.) To printer.
|
Apr 25, 2017
|
|
Apr 26, 2017
|
-
In Assembly.
-
Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
|
May 19, 2017
|
-
Waiver granted effective: May 19, 2017.
|
Jun 02, 2017
|
-
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
-
Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
-
Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
|
Jun 03, 2017
|
|
Jun 04, 2017
|
-
In Senate.
-
Assembly Amendment Nos. 881 and 1114 concurred in.
-
Action reconsidered.
|
Jun 05, 2017
|
-
Assembly Amendment Nos. 881 and 1114 concurred in. To enrollment.
|
Jun 08, 2017
|
-
Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
|
Jun 12, 2017
|
-
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 539.
|
Sections 3 to 9 inclusive, effective July 1, 2017. Section 1 effective October 1, 2017. Section 2 effective January 1, 2020.
|