Bill History |
Mar 20, 2017
|
-
Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.
|
Mar 21, 2017
|
-
From printer. To committee.
|
Apr 21, 2017
|
-
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
-
Placed on Second Reading File.
-
Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 433.) To printer.
|
Apr 24, 2017
|
|
Apr 25, 2017
|
-
In Assembly.
-
Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
|
May 11, 2017
|
|
May 15, 2017
|
|
May 16, 2017
|
-
Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
|
May 17, 2017
|
-
Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
|
May 18, 2017
|
-
Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
|
May 19, 2017
|
-
Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
|
May 22, 2017
|
|
May 23, 2017
|
-
In Senate. To enrollment.
|
May 25, 2017
|
-
Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
|
May 30, 2017
|
-
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 227.
|
Effective July 1, 2017.
|