Introduced
in the Senate
on Mar 16, 2017.
|
|
By:
(Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Gansert, Ford, Parks, Cancela, Cannizzaro, Goicoechea, Hammond, Hardy, Ratti, Roberson
|
Revises provisions governing the regulation of applied behavior analysis. (BDR 39-633) |
DECLARED EXEMPT |
Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
|
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.
|
Past Hearings
|
Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy |
Mar 22, 2017 08:00 AM
|
Agenda
|
Minutes
|
Heard, No Action
|
Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy |
Apr 14, 2017 08:30 AM
|
Agenda
|
Minutes
|
Amend, and do pass as amended
|
Senate Finance |
May 02, 2017 06:30 PM
|
Agenda
|
Minutes
|
Heard, No Action
|
Senate Finance |
May 04, 2017 06:00 PM
|
Agenda
|
Minutes
|
Re-refer
|
Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy |
May 12, 2017 08:00 AM
|
Agenda
|
Minutes
|
Amend, and do pass as amended
|
Assembly Health and Human Services |
May 31, 2017 See Agenda
|
Agenda
|
Minutes
|
Heard
|
Assembly Health and Human Services |
Jun 05, 2017 12:40 AM
|
|
|
|
Assembly Health and Human Services |
Jun 05, 2017 See Agenda
|
Agenda
|
Minutes
|
Amend, and do pass as amended
|
Bill History |
Mar 16, 2017
|
-
Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To printer.
|
Mar 17, 2017
|
-
From printer. To committee.
|
Apr 12, 2017
|
-
Notice of eligibility for exemption.
|
Apr 24, 2017
|
-
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
-
Placed on Second Reading File.
-
Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 378.)
-
Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.
|
Apr 25, 2017
|
-
From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed.
First reprint
. To committee.
-
Exemption effective.
|
May 05, 2017
|
-
From committee: Re-refer to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy.
-
Re-referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To committee.
|
May 22, 2017
|
-
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
-
Placed on General File.
-
Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 698.)
-
Reprinting dispensed with.
-
Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended.
(Yeas: 21, Nays: None.)
-
To printer.
|
May 23, 2017
|
-
From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed.
Second reprint
. To Assembly.
-
In Assembly.
-
Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.
|
Jun 05, 2017
|
-
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
-
Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
-
Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1152.)
-
Dispensed with reprinting.
-
Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved.
(Yeas: 37, Nays: 5.)
-
To printer.
-
From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed.
Third reprint
.
-
To Senate.
-
In Senate.
-
Assembly Amendment No. 1152 concurred in. To enrollment.
|
Jun 08, 2017
|
-
Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
|
Jun 14, 2017
|
-
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 588.
|
Sections 74 and 78 effective June 14, 2017. Sections 1 to 71, inclusive, 73, 75, 76 and 77 effective January 1, 2019. Section 72 effective July 1, 2026. Sections 22 and 32 expire by limitation the date on which the provisions of 42 U.S.C. § 666 requiring each state to establish procedures under which the state has authority to withhold or suspend, or to restrict the use of professional, occupational and recreational licenses of persons who: have failed to comply with a subpoena or warrant relating to a proceeding to determine the paternity of a child or to establish or enforce an obligation for the support of a child; or are in arrears in the payment for the support of one or more children,
are repealed by the Congress of the United States.
|