Bill History |
Mar 15, 2017
|
-
Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.
|
Mar 16, 2017
|
-
From printer. To committee.
|
Apr 11, 2017
|
-
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
|
Apr 12, 2017
|
-
Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 166.) To printer.
|
Apr 13, 2017
|
-
From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed.
First reprint
.
-
Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
|
Apr 14, 2017
|
-
Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
|
Apr 17, 2017
|
-
Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
|
Apr 18, 2017
|
-
Taken from General File.
-
Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.
|
Apr 20, 2017
|
-
Taken from Chief Clerk's desk.
-
Placed on General File.
-
Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 561.) To printer.
|
Apr 21, 2017
|
-
From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed.
Second reprint
.
-
Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
|
Apr 24, 2017
|
-
Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
|
Apr 25, 2017
|
|
Apr 26, 2017
|
-
In Senate.
-
Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.
|
May 04, 2017
|
|
May 05, 2017
|
|
May 08, 2017
|
-
Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
|
May 09, 2017
|
-
Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
|
May 11, 2017
|
|
May 15, 2017
|
-
In Assembly. To enrollment.
|
May 17, 2017
|
-
Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
|
May 22, 2017
|
-
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 65.
|
Effective October 1, 2017.
|