Introduced
in the Assembly
on Mar 10, 2017.
|
|
By:
(Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Spiegel, Joiner, Diaz, Bilbray-Axelrod, Carlton, Cohen, Miller, Swank, Thompson, Yeager, Parks, Manendo, Segerblom
|
Revises provisions relating to employment practices. (BDR 53-289) |
Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
|
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.
|
Bill History |
Mar 10, 2017
|
-
Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.
|
Mar 13, 2017
|
-
From printer. To committee.
|
Apr 21, 2017
|
-
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
|
Apr 24, 2017
|
-
Waiver granted effective: April 24, 2017.
-
Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 399.) To printer.
|
Apr 25, 2017
|
-
From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed.
First reprint
.
-
Taken from General File.
-
Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.
|
May 19, 2017
|
-
Taken from Chief Clerk's desk.
-
Placed on General File.
-
Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 646.) To printer.
|
May 22, 2017
|
|
May 23, 2017
|
-
In Senate.
-
Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To committee.
|
May 24, 2017
|
-
From committee: Do pass.
-
Placed on Second Reading File.
-
Read second time.
|
May 25, 2017
|
-
Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
|
May 26, 2017
|
|
May 29, 2017
|
-
Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
|
Jun 03, 2017
|
-
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 324.
|
Effective June 3, 2017.
|