AB262 | View Bill in NELIS |
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 07, 2017. | |
By:
(Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship) Carrillo |
|
Revises provisions relating to contracts for the sale of vehicles. (BDR 52-937) |
|
Fiscal Notes |
|
Effect on Local Government: No. Effect on State: No. |
Most Recent History Action: (See full list below) |
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 169. |
Upcoming Hearings |
Past Hearings |
||||
Assembly Commerce and Labor | Mar 22, 2017 01:30 PM | Agenda | Minutes | Heard |
Assembly Commerce and Labor | Apr 10, 2017 See Agenda | Agenda | Minutes | Amend, and do pass as amended |
Assembly Commerce and Labor | Apr 12, 2017 See Agenda | Agenda | Minutes | Rescind previous action on: 4-10-17 Amend, and do pass as amended |
Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy | May 03, 2017 08:00 AM | Agenda | Minutes | Heard, No Action |
Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy | May 17, 2017 08:00 AM | Agenda | Minutes | Do pass |
Final Passage Votes | |||||||
Assembly Final Passage | (1st Reprint) | Apr 25, 2017 | Yea 42, | Nay 0, | Excused 0, | Not Voting 0, | Absent 0 |
Senate Final Passage | (1st Reprint) | May 18, 2017 | Yea 21, | Nay 0, | Excused 0, | Not Voting 0, | Absent 0 |
Bill Text | As Introduced 1st Reprint As Enrolled |
Adopted Amendments | Amend. No. 554 |
Bill History |
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
Effective October 1, 2017. |