Bill History |
Mar 03, 2017
|
-
Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.
|
Mar 06, 2017
|
-
From printer. To committee.
|
Apr 20, 2017
|
-
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
-
Placed on Second Reading File.
-
Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 550.) To printer.
|
Apr 21, 2017
|
-
From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed.
First reprint
.
-
Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
|
Apr 24, 2017
|
-
Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
|
Apr 25, 2017
|
|
Apr 26, 2017
|
-
In Senate.
-
Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To committee.
|
May 16, 2017
|
-
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
-
Placed on Second Reading File.
-
Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 737.) To printer.
|
May 17, 2017
|
|
May 18, 2017
|
-
In Assembly.
-
Senate Amendment No. 737 concurred in. To enrollment.
|
May 23, 2017
|
-
Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
|
May 26, 2017
|
-
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 168.
|
Effective May 26, 2017.
|