Bill History |
Feb 13, 2017
|
-
Prefiled.
-
Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.
|
Feb 15, 2017
|
-
From printer. To committee.
|
Mar 17, 2017
|
-
Notice of eligibility for exemption.
|
Apr 24, 2017
|
-
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
-
Placed on Second Reading File.
-
Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 88.)
-
Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.
|
Apr 25, 2017
|
-
From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed.
First reprint
. To committee.
-
Exemption effective.
|
May 23, 2017
|
-
From committee: Do pass as amended.
-
Placed on General File.
-
Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended.
(Yeas: 13, Nays: 8.)
To Assembly.
|
May 24, 2017
|
-
In Assembly.
-
Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.
|
May 31, 2017
|
-
From committee: Do pass.
-
Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
-
Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
|
Jun 01, 2017
|
-
Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
|
Jun 02, 2017
|
|
Jun 03, 2017
|
-
In Senate. To enrollment.
|
Jun 05, 2017
|
-
Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
|
Jun 14, 2017
|
-
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 587.
|
Effective June 14, 2017, for the purpose of adopting regulations and performing any other preparatory tasks necessary to carry out the provisions of this act; and January 1, 2018, for all other purposes.
|