Bill History |
Feb 13, 2017
|
-
Prefiled pursuant to JSR 14.2.1(d).
-
Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer.
|
Feb 14, 2017
|
-
From printer. To committee.
|
Apr 10, 2017
|
-
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
|
Apr 11, 2017
|
-
Taken from Second Reading File.
-
Placed on Second Reading File for next legislative day.
|
Apr 12, 2017
|
-
Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 52.) To printer.
|
Apr 13, 2017
|
-
From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed.
First reprint
.
-
Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
|
Apr 14, 2017
|
-
Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
|
Apr 17, 2017
|
-
Taken from General File.
-
Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.
|
Apr 20, 2017
|
-
Exempt pursuant to Joint Standing Rule 14.6, subsection 4(a).
|
Jun 06, 2017
|
-
(No further action taken.)
|
|