Bill History |
Feb 13, 2017
|
-
Prefiled pursuant to JSR 14.2.1(d).
-
Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.
|
Feb 14, 2017
|
-
From printer. To committee.
|
Mar 10, 2017
|
|
Mar 13, 2017
|
|
Mar 14, 2017
|
|
Mar 15, 2017
|
-
In Senate.
-
Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
|
May 17, 2017
|
-
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
-
Placed on Second Reading File.
-
Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 639.) To printer.
|
May 18, 2017
|
|
May 19, 2017
|
-
In Assembly.
-
Senate Amendment No. 639 concurred in. To enrollment.
|
May 23, 2017
|
-
Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
|
May 26, 2017
|
-
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 137.
|
Effective July 1, 2017, and applies to a Canadian domestic-violence protection order issued before, on or after July 1, 2017, and to a continuing action for enforcement of a Canadian domestic-violence protection order commenced before, on or after July 1, 2017.
|