Bill History |
Feb 07, 2017
|
-
Prefiled.
-
Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.
|
Feb 08, 2017
|
-
From printer. To committee.
|
Mar 06, 2017
|
|
Mar 07, 2017
|
|
Mar 08, 2017
|
|
Mar 09, 2017
|
-
In Assembly.
-
Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
|
Mar 10, 2017
|
-
Withdrawn from committee.
-
Rereferred to Committee on Corrections, Parole, and Probation. To committee.
|
May 23, 2017
|
-
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
-
Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
-
Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
|
May 24, 2017
|
-
Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 792.) To printer.
|
May 25, 2017
|
-
From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed.
First reprint
.
-
Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
|
May 26, 2017
|
|
May 29, 2017
|
|
May 30, 2017
|
-
Assembly Amendment No. 792 concurred in. To enrollment.
|
Jun 01, 2017
|
-
Enrolled and delivered to Secretary of State.
-
File No. 38.
|
(Return to 2019 Session.)
|