Past Hearings
|
Assembly Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining |
Feb 07, 2017 See Agenda
|
Agenda
|
Minutes
|
Mentioned no jurisdiction
|
Senate Natural Resources |
Mar 02, 2017 01:00 PM
|
Agenda
|
Minutes
|
Heard, No Action
|
Assembly Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining |
Mar 14, 2017 01:30 PM
|
Agenda
|
Minutes
|
Mentioned no jurisdiction
|
Senate Natural Resources |
Mar 16, 2017 01:30 PM
|
Agenda
|
Minutes
|
Amend, and do pass as amended
|
Senate Natural Resources |
Mar 23, 2017 01:30 PM
|
Agenda
|
Minutes
|
After Passage Discussion
|
Assembly Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining |
Apr 13, 2017 01:30 PM
|
Agenda
|
Minutes
|
Mentioned no jurisdiction
|
Senate Finance |
Apr 17, 2017 08:00 AM
|
Agenda
|
Minutes
|
Heard, No Action
|
Assembly Ways and Means |
May 11, 2017 08:00 AM
|
Agenda
|
Minutes
|
Mentioned no jurisdiction
|
Senate Natural Resources |
May 18, 2017 See Agenda
|
Agenda
|
Minutes
|
Mentioned Not Agendized
|
Senate Finance |
May 23, 2017 08:00 AM
|
Agenda
|
Minutes
|
Amend, and do pass as amended
|
Assembly Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining |
May 30, 2017 See Agenda
|
Agenda
|
Minutes
|
Heard Do pass
|
Bill History |
Nov 17, 2016
|
-
Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources. To printer.
|
Nov 23, 2016
|
|
Feb 06, 2017
|
-
Read first time. To committee.
|
Feb 20, 2017
|
-
Notice of eligibility for exemption.
|
Apr 07, 2017
|
-
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
|
Apr 10, 2017
|
-
Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 71.)
-
Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.
|
Apr 11, 2017
|
-
From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed.
First reprint
. To committee.
-
Exemption effective.
|
May 26, 2017
|
-
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
-
Placed on General File.
-
Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 919.)
-
Reprinting dispensed with.
-
Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended.
(Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.)
-
To printer.
-
From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed.
Second reprint
. To Assembly.
-
In Assembly.
-
Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining. To committee.
|
May 30, 2017
|
-
From committee: Do pass.
-
Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
-
Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
|
May 31, 2017
|
-
Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
|
Jun 01, 2017
|
-
Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
|
Jun 02, 2017
|
-
Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
|
Jun 03, 2017
|
-
Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
|
Jun 04, 2017
|
|
Jun 05, 2017
|
-
In Senate. To enrollment.
|
Jun 08, 2017
|
-
Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
|
Jun 09, 2017
|
-
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 520.
|
Effective June 9, 2017.
|