Bill History |
Mar 27, 2017
|
-
Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.
|
Mar 29, 2017
|
-
From printer. To committee.
|
Apr 13, 2017
|
|
Apr 14, 2017
|
|
Apr 17, 2017
|
-
Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
|
Apr 18, 2017
|
|
Apr 19, 2017
|
-
In Senate.
-
Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs.
-
To committee.
|
Apr 27, 2017
|
|
Apr 28, 2017
|
|
May 01, 2017
|
|
May 02, 2017
|
-
In Assembly. To enrollment.
|
May 05, 2017
|
-
Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
|
May 08, 2017
|
-
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 15.
|
Effective July 1, 2017.
|