BDR | REQUESTER | DATE | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
S--1301 AB542 |
Assembly Committee on Ways and Means
Temporarily delays the statutory deadline for notifying school employees of reemployment status. |
4/21/2009 Ch. 18 |
||
S--1302 SB418 |
Senate Committee on Finance
Eliminates requirement for transfer from the Abandoned Property Trust Account. |
4/22/2009 Ch. 468 |
||
31--1303 SB428 |
Senate Committee on Finance
Revises provisions governing the administration of the Millennium Scholarship program. |
4/22/2009 Ch. 277 |
||
R--1304 ACR29 |
Assembly Committee on Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments
ACR: Recognizes April 28, 2009, as Equal Pay Day. |
4/24/2009 File 59 |
||
R--1305 ACR30 |
Assembly Committee on Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments
ACR: Directs the Legislative Commission to conduct an interim study on the development and promotion of logistics and distribution centers in this State. |
4/27/2009 File 96 |
||
R--1306 SCR29 |
Senate Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections
SCR: Memorializes former Nevada State Climatologist, John James. |
4/23/2009 File 65 |
||
R--1307 SCR31 |
Senate Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections
Recognizes the month of May as Dandy-Walker Syndrome and Hydrocephalus Awareness Month. |
4/23/2009 File 70 |
||
57--1308 AB546 |
Assembly Committee on Ways and Means
Provides for a second election period to continue health care benefits in accordance with federal law. |
4/28/2009 Ch. 439 |
||
35--1309 AB550 |
Assembly Committee on Ways and Means
Provides for Valley of Fire State Park commercial wedding program. |
4/29/2009 |
||
43--1310 SB417 |
Senate Committee on Finance
Revises provisions governing financial administration. |
4/30/2009 |
||
S--1311 SB425 |
Senate Committee on Finance
Extends reversion for previous session appropriation for the Institute for Neuro-Immune Disease. |
4/27/2009 Ch. 410 |
||
R--1312 SCR35 |
Senate Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections
SCR: Urges Congress to enact legislation allowing states to collect sales taxes on remote sales including sales on the Internet. |
5/06/2009 File 91 |
||
S--1313 SB424 |
Senate Committee on Finance
Makes an appropriation to the Attorney General's Tort Claim Fund. |
5/08/2009 Ch. 409 |
||
49--1314 AB556 |
Assembly Committee on Ways and Means
Eliminates requirement in statute for a Weed Control Analyst in the Department of Agriculture. |
5/10/2009 Ch. 318 |
||
38--1315 AB555 |
Assembly Committee on Ways and Means
Revises provisions governing the Senior Citizens Property Tax Assistance account. |
5/10/2009 Ch. 401 |
||
32--1316 |
Legislative Counsel
Makes various changes concerning state financial administration. |
5/17/2009 |
||
S--1317 SB431 |
Senate Committee on Finance
Authorizes expenditures by agencies of State Government. |
5/18/2009 Ch. 392 |
||
S--1318 AB562 |
Assembly Committee on Ways and Means
Makes various changes regarding state financial administration. |
5/18/2009 Ch. 388 |
||
32--1319 |
Senate Committee of the Whole
Revises provisions governing state financial administration. |
5/19/2009 |
||
32--1320 SB429 |
Senate Committee of the Whole
Revises provisions governing state financial administration. |
5/19/2009 Ch. 395 |
||
S--1321 SB432 |
Senator Horsford
Provides for the establishment of a commission to coordinate an in-depth study to improve the stability, equity, transparency and competitiveness of the unique economic and fiscal structure of the State of Nevada. |
5/19/2009 |
||
S--1322 AB563 |
Assembly Committee on Ways and Means
Ensures sufficient funding for K-12 public education for the 2009-2011 biennium. |
5/20/2009 Ch. 389 |
||
S--1323 SB433 |
Senate Committee on Finance
Provides for salaries of certain state employees. |
5/20/2009 Ch. 391 |
||
R--1324 SR10 |
Legislative Counsel
SR: Expresses and explains public policy governing Senate Standing Rule No. 23. |
5/20/2009 File 82 |
||
R--1325 AR10 |
Legislative Counsel
AR: Expresses and explains public policy governing Assembly Standing Rule No. 23. |
5/20/2009 File 88 |
||
R--1326 AR11 |
Assembly Committee on Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments
AR: Revises Assembly Standing Rules. |
5/20/2009 File 90 |
||
R--1327 SR9 |
Senate Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections
SR: Revises Senate Standing Rules. |
5/20/2009 File 81 |
||
S--1328 SB435 |
Legislative Counsel
Makes corrections to certain legislative measures. |
5/23/2009 Ch. 429 |
||
R--1329 AR12 |
Assembly Committee on Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments
AR: Designates Assembly members of the Legislative Commission for the 2009-2011 biennium. |
5/25/2009 File 93 |
||
R--1330 SR11 |
Senate Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections
SR: Designates Senate members of the Legislative Commission for the 2009-2011 biennium. |
5/25/2009 File 94 |
||
14--1331 |
Legislative Counsel
Makes technical corrections. |
5/25/2009 |
||
R--1332 SCR36 |
Senate Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections
SCR: Memorializes Commander Luther H. Hook III of the Naval Air Station at Fallon. |
5/26/2009 File 95 |
||
R--1333 SCR39 |
Senate Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections
SCR: Requires the Committee on Health Care to adopt certain recommendations regarding the provision of health care. |
5/27/2009 File 101 |
||
R--1334 SCR37 |
Senate Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections
SCR: Requires the conduct of a study of the state's revenue system. |
5/27/2009 File 102 |
||
S--1335 |
Legislative Counsel
Makes corrections to certain legislative measures. |
5/28/2009 |
||
S--1336 AB564 |
Assembly Committee on Ways and Means
Authorizes and provides funding for certain projects of capital improvement. |
5/28/2009 Ch. 440 |
||
R--1337 ACR34 |
Assembly Committee on Ways and Means
ACR: Provides for the Interim Finance Committee to create the Legislative Committee for Federal Stimulus Oversight. |
5/31/2009 File 97 |
||
R--1338 SCR38 |
Senate Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections
SCR: Requires Legislative Commission to study redevelopment. |
5/31/2009 |
||
1339 |
Senate Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections
SCR: Directs Legislative Committee on Health Care to consider establishment of a health insurance exchange. |
6/01/2009 |
First | Previous |
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Employment Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us | Website Feedback © Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau |