Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AB98
Introduced on: Feb 21, 2005
By: Ways and Means
Makes appropriation to Motor Pool Division of Department of Administration for additional vehicles. (BDR S-1209)
DECLARED EXEMPT
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Contains Appropriation included in Executive Budget.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 287.

Upcoming Hearings
    
Past Hearings
  Assembly Ways and Means     Feb-21-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      Discussed as BDR.
  Assembly Ways and Means     Mar-29-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      No Action.
  Assembly Ways and Means     May-28-2005 09:00 AM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
  Senate Finance     Jun-03-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      Do pass.
    
 
Votes
  Assembly Final Passage    Jun-01   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Senate Final Passage    Jun-03   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text As Introduced     1st Reprint                         As Enrolled        
Amendments Amend. No.1124

Bill History

Feb 21, 2005

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer.

Feb 22, 2005

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 07, 2005

  • Notice of exemption.

May 31, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1124.) To printer.

Jun 01, 2005

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.

Jun 02, 2005

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To committee.

Jun 03, 2005

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

Jun 04, 2005

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 06, 2005

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 287.
  • Effective June 6, 2005.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Employment Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us |   


© 2025 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo