Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AB97
Introduced on: Feb 21, 2005
By: Ways and Means
Makes appropriation to Account for the Governor's Portrait to provide money for preparation and framing of portrait of Governor Kenny C. Guinn. (BDR S-1207)
DECLARED EXEMPT
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Contains Appropriation included in Executive Budget.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 26.

Upcoming Hearings
    
Past Hearings
  Assembly Ways and Means     Feb-21-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      Discussed as BDR.
  Assembly Ways and Means     Mar-07-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      No Action.
  Assembly Ways and Means     Mar-14-2005 08:30 AM    Minutes      Do pass.
  Senate Finance     Apr-18-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      Do pass.
    
 
Votes
  Assembly Final Passage    Apr-04   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Senate Final Passage    Apr-20   Yea 20,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text As Introduced                             As Enrolled        
Amendments

Bill History

Feb 21, 2005

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer.

Feb 22, 2005

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 07, 2005

  • Notice of exemption.

Mar 15, 2005

  • From committee: Do pass.

Mar 16, 2005

  • Read second time.

Mar 17, 2005

  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.

Apr 04, 2005

  • Taken from Chief Clerk's desk.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.

Apr 05, 2005

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To committee.

Apr 18, 2005

  • From committee: Do pass.

Apr 19, 2005

  • Read second time.

Apr 20, 2005

  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly.

Apr 21, 2005

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

Apr 22, 2005

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Apr 25, 2005

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 26.
  • Effective April 25, 2005.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Employment Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us |   


© 2025 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo