Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AB41
Introduced on: Feb 04, 2005
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Horne
Makes appropriation for support of Mental Health Court in Clark County. (BDR S-812)
DECLARED EXEMPT
Fiscal Notes View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Contains Appropriation not included in Executive Budget.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings
    
Past Hearings
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Feb-16-2005 01:30 PM    Minutes      Pending.
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Feb-21-2005 01:30 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
  Senate Human Resources and Education     Mar-07-2005 01:30 PM    Minutes      Mentioned Not Agendized.
  Assembly Ways and Means     Mar-14-2005 08:30 AM    Minutes      No Action.
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Mar-21-2005 01:30 PM    Minutes      Mentioned Not Agendized.
    
 
Votes
 
Bill Text As Introduced     1st Reprint                                
Amendments Amend. No.8

Bill History

Feb 04, 2005

  • Prefiled.
  • Referred to Concurrent Committees on Health and Human Services and Ways and Means. To printer.

Feb 05, 2005

  • From printer.

Feb 07, 2005

  • Read first time. To committees.

Feb 23, 2005

  • From Concurrent Committee on Health and Human Services: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Feb 24, 2005

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 8.) To printer.

Feb 25, 2005

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • To Concurrent Committee on Ways and Means.

Mar 07, 2005

  • Notice of exemption.

Jun 07, 2005

  • (No further action taken.)

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Employment Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us |   


© 2025 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo