AB353
Versions: As Introduced First Reprint Second Reprint Third Reprint As EnrolledBDR 34-153
Introduced:04/10/97
Introduced By: Giunchigliani
Summary: Makes various changes regarding financing new construction, design, maintenance and repair of school facilities. (BDR 34-153)
Heard in the the following Committees: | ||
Assembly: | INFRASTRUCTURE 4-23; 5-5 sub; 5-19 sub; 5-28 sub; 6-2 sub; 6-4 sub; 6-9; 6-18; 6-20; 6-23; 6-25 AND WAYS AND MEANS 6-30; 7-2 | |
Senate: | HUMAN RESOURCES AND FACILITIES 6-2 AND TAXATION 6-17 AND FINANCE 7-5; 7-6 ( 2 mtgs) |
- 04/10/97 Read first time. Referred to Concurrent Committees on Infrastructure and Ways and Means. To printer.
- 04/11/97 From printer. To committees.
- 06/23/97 From Concurrent Committee on Infrastructure: Amend, and re-refer to Concurrent Committee on Infrastructure.
- 06/24/97 Taken from Second Reading File. Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.
- 06/26/97 Taken from Chief Clerk's desk. Placed on Second Reading File.
- 06/26/97 Read second time. Amended. To printer.
- 06/27/97 From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To Concurrent Committee on Ways and Means.
- 07/03/97 From Concurrent Committee on Ways and Means: Amend, and do pass as amended.
- 07/03/97 Placed on General File.
- 07/03/97 Read third time. Amended. To printer.
- 07/03/97 From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint.
- 07/04/97 Read third time.
- 07/04/97 Taken from General File. Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.
- 07/04/97 Taken from Chief Clerk's desk. Placed on General File.
- 07/04/97 Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. To Senate.
- 07/05/97 In Senate. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To committee.
- 07/06/97 From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Placed on Second Reading File.
- 07/06/97 Read second time. Amended. To printer.
- 07/07/97 From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Third reprint. Placed on General File.
- 07/07/97 Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk.
- 07/07/97 Taken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File.
- 07/07/97 Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. To Assembly.
- 07/07/97 In Assembly.
- 07/07/97 Senate amendment concurred in. To enrollment.
- 07/14/97 Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
- 07/16/97 Approved by the Governor.
- 07/17/97 Chapter 516.
- 07/25/97 Sections 1 to 7, inclusive, 9, 10, 22 to 25, inclusive, and 27 to 31, inclusive, of this act, effective July 16, 1997. Sections 22 to 25, inclusive, of this act, expire by limitation June 30, 1999. Sections 11, 11.5, 13, 14, 14.5, 16, 20 and 21 of this act effective August 1, 1997. Section 8, 12 and 15 of this act effective July 1, 1999. Section 17, 18 and 19 of this act effective October 1, 1997, and expire by limitation June 30, 2008. Section 26 of this act effective July 1, 2008.