AB401
Versions: As Introduced First Reprint Second Reprint Third Reprint Fourth Reprint Fifth Reprint As EnrolledBDR 38-599
Introduced:04/23/97
Introduced By: Health and Human Services
Summary: Makes various changes regarding administration of public welfare and enforcement of support for children. (BDR 38-599)
Heard in the the following Committees: | ||
Assembly: | HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES 4-28; 4-30; 5-5; 5-6; 5-13 AND JUDICIARY 5-13; 5-14 am; 5-14 pm; 5-15 am; 5-15 pm; 5-26 AND WAYS AND MEANS 6-7; 6-13 sub; 6-18 | |
Senate: | HUMAN RESOURCES AND FACILITIES 6-25; 7-2 AND LEGISLATIVE AFFAIRS AND OPERATIONS 6-17 AND FINANCE 7-3 |
- 04/23/97 Read first time. Referred to Concurrent Committees on Health and Human Services, Judiciary, and Ways and Means. To printer.
- 04/24/97 From printer. To committees.
- 05/27/97 From Concurrent Committees on Health and Human Services and Judiciary: Amend, and do pass as amended.
- 05/28/97 Taken from Second Reading File. Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.
- 05/28/97 Taken from Chief Clerk's desk. Placed on Second Reading File.
- 05/28/97 Read second time. Amended. To printer.
- 05/29/97 From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To Concurrent Committee on Ways and Means.
- 06/04/97 From Concurrent Committee on Ways and Means: Amend, and re-refer to Concurrent Committee on Ways and Means.
- 06/05/97 Read third time. Amended. Re-referred to Concurrent Committee on Ways and Means. To printer.
- 06/06/97 From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint. To Concurrent Committee on Ways and Means.
- 06/18/97 From Concurrent Committee on Ways and Means: Amend, and do pass as amended.
- 06/19/97 Read third time. Amended. To printer.
- 06/20/97 From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Third reprint.
- 06/20/97 Placed on General File.
- 06/20/97 Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. To Senate.
- 06/21/97 In Senate. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Human Resources and Facilities. To committee.
- 07/02/97 From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Placed on Second Reading File.
- 07/02/97 Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.
- 07/03/97 From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Fourth reprint. To committee.
- 07/03/97 From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Placed on General File.
- 07/03/97 Read third time. Amended. To printer.
- 07/04/97 From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Fifth reprint. Placed on General File.
- 07/04/97 Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. To Assembly.
- 07/05/97 In Assembly.
- 07/05/97 Senate amendments concurred in.
- 07/05/97 To enrollment.
- 07/10/97 Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
- 07/16/97 Approved by the Governor.
- 07/17/97 Chapter 489.
- 07/23/97 Sections 112, 319 and 325 of this act effective June 30, 1997. Sections 1 to 6, inclusive, 10 to 15, inclusive, 30 to 33, inclusive, 35, 36, 40 to 43, inclusive, 102, 105.5, 106, 107, 113, 114, 283, 284, 308, 309, 321, 323.3 323.7, 324, and subsection 1 of section 320 of this act effective July 1, 1997. Sections 26, 28, 34, 37 and 39 of this act effective 12:01 a.m. July 1, 1997. For purposes of adopting regulations and conducting preliminary activities necessary to carry out provisions of this act in a timely manner, remaining provisions of this act effective July 16, 1997. For all other purposes, sections 44 to 82, inclusive, 83 to 88, inclusive, 89, 90, 91, 92, 93, 94, 95, 96 to 100, inclusive, 103, 104, 105, 108 to 111, inclusive, 115 to 126, inclusive, 127, 128, 129 to 133, inclusive, 134, 135, 136, 137, 138, 139 to 154, inclusive, 155, 156, 157, 158 to 172, inclusive, 173 to 183, inclusive, 184 to 190, inclusive, 190.5, 191, 192, 193, 194, 277 to 277.7, inclusive, 278.1 to 282, inclusive, 285 to 307, inclusive, 322 to 323 of this act, and subsection 2 of section 320 of this act effective October 1, 1997, and sections 7, 8, 9, 16 to 25, inclusive, 82.5, 88.5, 90.5, 91.5, 92.5, 95.5, 126.5, 128.5, 133.5, 136.5, 137.5, 138.5, 154.5, 157.5, 172.5, 183.5, 190.3, 192.5, 193.5, 195 to 276, inclusive, 278, 308.5 and 310 to 318, inclusive, of this act, and subsection 3 of section 320 of this act effective January 1, 1998. Sections 123.5 and 277.1 of this act expire by limitation January 1, 1998.