Meetings

Location(s)

  • Room 4412, Grant Sawyer State Office Building, 555 E. Washington Avenue Las Vegas, Nevada
  • Videoconferenced to Room 3138 of the Legislative Building, 401 S. Carson St. Carson City, Nevada


Location(s)

  • Room 4412, Grant Sawyer State Office Building, 555 E. Washington Avenue Las Vegas, Nevada
  • Videoconferenced to Room 2135 of the Legislative Building, 401 S. Carson St. Carson City, Nevada


Location(s)

  • Room 4412, Grant Sawyer State Office Building, 555 E. Washington Avenue Las Vegas, Nevada
  • Videoconferenced to Room 1214 of the Legislative Building, 401 S. Carson St. Carson City, Nevada


Location(s)

  • Room 1214 of the Legislative Building, 401 S. Carson St. Carson City, Nevada
  • Videoconferenced to Room 4401 of the Grant Sawyer State Office Building, 555 E. Washington Avenue Las Vegas, Nevada


Wednesday, May 17, 2000 8:30 AM

This is the Fifth of the 2001 - 2000 interim

Location(s)

  • Room 4401 of the Grant Sawyer Building, 555 East Washington Ave, Las Vegas, Nevada
  • Videoconferenced to Room 1214 of the Legislative Building, 401 S. Carson St. Carson City, Nevada


Wednesday, April 5, 2000 8:30 AM

This is the Fourth of the 2001 - 2000 interim

Location(s)

  • Room 4412 of the Grant Sawyer Building, 555 East Washington Ave, Las Vegas, NV
  • Videoconferenced to Room 3138 of the Legislative Building, 401 S. Carson St. Carson City, Nevada


Wednesday, March 1, 2000 10:30 AM

This is the Third of the 2001 - 2000 interim

Location(s)

  • Room 1214 of the Legislative Building, 401 S. Carson St. Carson City, Nevada
  • Videoconferenced to Room 4412 of the Grant Sawyer Building, 555 East Washington Ave, Las Vegas, NV


Monday, February 7, 2000 10:00 AM

This is the Second of the 2001 - 2000 interim

Location(s)

  • Room 4412, Grant Sawyer State Office Building, 555 E. Washington Avenue Las Vegas, Nevada
  • Videoconferenced to Room 3138 of the Legislative Building, 401 S. Carson St. Carson City, Nevada


Friday, December 17, 1999 1:15 PM

This is the First of the 2001 - 2000 interim

Location(s)

  • Room 4401, Grant Sawyer State Office Building, 555 E. Washington Avenue Las Vegas, Nevada
  • Videoconferenced to Room 3138 of the Legislative Building, 401 S. Carson St. Carson City, Nevada