Events

Legislative committees and committees affiliated with the Legislature are displayed as links within the panels below.

5/5/2025
11:00 AM
View Event
Senate Floor Session

The Agenda will be posted 30 minutes prior to commencement.
The Senate is scheduled to convene at 11:00 AM on Monday, May 5, 2025.
5/5/2025
11:30 AM
View Event
Assembly Floor Session

The Agenda will be posted 30 minutes prior to commencement.
The Assembly is scheduled to convene at 11:30 AM on Monday, May 5, 2025.

There are no events today.

Monday, May 5, 2025

8:00 AM
  • Room 4100 of the Legislative Building, 401 South Carson Street, Carson City, NV.
  • Videoconferenced to Room 6 of the Nevada Legislature Hearing Rooms, 7120 Amigo Street, Las Vegas, NV.
8:30 AM
  • Room 3143 of the Legislative Building, 401 South Carson Street, Carson City, NV.
  • Videoconferenced to Room 1 of the Nevada Legislature Hearing Rooms, 7120 Amigo Street, Las Vegas, NV.

8:30 AM
  • Room 2134 of the Legislative Building, 401 South Carson Street, Carson City, NV.
  • Videoconferenced to Room 5 of the Nevada Legislature Hearing Rooms, 7120 Amigo Street, Las Vegas, NV.

9:00 AM
  • Room 3138 of the Legislative Building, 401 South Carson Street, Carson City, NV.
  • Videoconferenced to Room 3 of the Nevada Legislature Hearing Rooms, 7120 Amigo Street, Las Vegas, NV.

1:00 PM
  • Room 2134 of the Legislative Building, 401 South Carson Street, Carson City, NV.
  • Videoconferenced to Room 7 of the Nevada Legislature Hearing Rooms, 7120 Amigo Street, Las Vegas, NV.

1:00 PM
  • Room 1214 of the Legislative Building, 401 South Carson Street, Carson City, NV.
  • Videoconferenced to Room 6 of the Nevada Legislature Hearing Rooms, 7120 Amigo Street, Las Vegas, NV.

1:30 PM
  • Room 4100 of the Legislative Building, 401 South Carson Street, Carson City, NV.
  • Videoconferenced to Room 1 of the Nevada Legislature Hearing Rooms, 7120 Amigo Street, Las Vegas, NV.

1:30 PM
  • Room 3138 of the Legislative Building, 401 South Carson Street, Carson City, NV.
  • Videoconferenced to Room 3 of the Nevada Legislature Hearing Rooms, 7120 Amigo Street, Las Vegas, NV.

3:30 PM
  • Room 2149 of the Legislative Building, 401 South Carson Street, Carson City, NV.
  • Videoconferenced to Room 8 of the Nevada Legislature Hearing Rooms, 7120 Amigo Street, Las Vegas, NV.

3:30 PM
  • Room 2144 of the Legislative Building, 401 South Carson Street, Carson City, NV.
  • Videoconferenced to Room 5 of the Nevada Legislature Hearing Rooms, 7120 Amigo Street, Las Vegas, NV.

4:00 PM
  • Room 3143 of the Legislative Building, 401 South Carson Street, Carson City, NV.
  • Videoconferenced to Room 2 of the Nevada Legislature Hearing Rooms, 7120 Amigo Street, Las Vegas, NV.
  • Videoconferenced to 123 High Technology Center, Great Basin College, 1500 College Pkwy., Elko, NV.

  
Tuesday, May 6, 2025

8:00 AM
  • Room 4100 of the Legislative Building, 401 South Carson Street, Carson City, NV.
  • Videoconferenced to Room 1 of the Nevada Legislature Hearing Rooms, 7120 Amigo Street, Las Vegas, NV.

8:00 AM
  • Room 3138 of the Legislative Building, 401 South Carson Street, Carson City, NV.
  • Videoconferenced to Room 3 of the Nevada Legislature Hearing Rooms, 7120 Amigo Street, Las Vegas, NV.

8:00 AM
  • Room 3137 of the Legislative Building, 401 South Carson Street, Carson City, NV.
  • Videoconferenced to Room 2 of the Nevada Legislature Hearing Rooms, 7120 Amigo Street, Las Vegas, NV.
1:00 PM
  • Room 1214 of the Legislative Building, 401 South Carson Street, Carson City, NV.
  • Videoconferenced to Room 6 of the Nevada Legislature Hearing Rooms, 7120 Amigo Street, Las Vegas, NV.

1:30 PM
  • Room 3138 of the Legislative Building, 401 South Carson Street, Carson City, NV.
  • Videoconferenced to Room 2 of the Nevada Legislature Hearing Rooms, 7120 Amigo Street, Las Vegas, NV.

1:30 PM
  • Room 3143 of the Legislative Building, 401 South Carson Street, Carson City, NV.
  • Videoconferenced to Room 3 of the Nevada Legislature Hearing Rooms, 7120 Amigo Street, Las Vegas, NV.

3:30 PM
  • Room 2134 of the Legislative Building, 401 South Carson Street, Carson City, NV.
  • Videoconferenced to Room 4 of the Nevada Legislature Hearing Rooms, 7120 Amigo Street, Las Vegas, NV.

3:30 PM

Canceled
4:00 PM
  • Room 3142 of the Legislative Building, 401 South Carson Street, Carson City, NV.
  • Videoconferenced to Room 4 of the Nevada Legislature Hearing Rooms, 7120 Amigo Street, Las Vegas, NV.

4:00 PM
  • Room 4100 of the Legislative Building, 401 South Carson Street, Carson City, NV.
  • Videoconferenced to Room 1 of the Nevada Legislature Hearing Rooms, 7120 Amigo Street, Las Vegas, NV.

  
Wednesday, May 7, 2025

8:00 AM
  • Room 3137 of the Legislative Building, 401 South Carson Street, Carson City, NV.
  • Room 2 of the Nevada Legislature Hearing Rooms, 7120 Amigo Street, Las Vegas, NV.
8:00 AM
  • Room 2134 of the Legislative Building, 401 South Carson Street, Carson City, NV.
  • Videoconferenced to Room 5 of the Nevada Legislature Hearing Rooms, 7120 Amigo Street, Las Vegas, NV.

1:00 PM
  • Room 1214 of the Legislative Building, 401 South Carson Street, Carson City, NV.
  • Videoconferenced to Room 6 of the Nevada Legislature Hearing Rooms, 7120 Amigo Street, Las Vegas, NV.

1:30 PM
  • Room 3138 of the Legislative Building, 401 South Carson Street, Carson City, NV.
  • Room 3 of the Nevada Legislature Hearing Rooms, 7120 Amigo Street, Las Vegas, NV.

SB138 (WS) , SB188 (WS) , SB295, SB306, SB349 (WS) , SB408
3:30 PM
  • Room 2149 of the Legislative Building, 401 South Carson Street, Carson City, NV.
  • Videoconferenced to Room 8 of the Nevada Legislature Hearing Rooms, 7120 Amigo Street, Las Vegas, NV.

4:00 PM
  • Room 3143 of the Legislative Building, 401 South Carson Street, Carson City, NV.
  • Videoconferenced to Room 2 of the Nevada Legislature Hearing Rooms, 7120 Amigo Street, Las Vegas, NV.
  • Videoconferenced to 123 High Technology Center, Great Basin College, 1500 College Pkwy., Elko, NV.

  
Thursday, May 8, 2025

8:00 AM
  • Room 4100 of the Legislative Building, 401 South Carson Street, Carson City, NV.
  • Videoconferenced to Room 2 of the Nevada Legislature Hearing Rooms, 7120 Amigo Street, Las Vegas, NV.
See Agenda
  • Room 3137 of the Legislative Building, 401 South Carson Street, Carson City, NV.
  • Videoconferenced to Room 2 of the Nevada Legislature Hearing Rooms, 7120 Amigo Street, Las Vegas, NV.
1:00 PM
  • Room 1214 of the Legislative Building, 401 South Carson Street, Carson City, NV.
  • Videoconferenced to Room 6 of the Nevada Legislature Hearing Rooms, 7120 Amigo Street, Las Vegas, NV.

1:30 PM
  • Room 3143 of the Legislative Building, 401 South Carson Street, Carson City, NV.
  • Videoconferenced to Room 3 of the Nevada Legislature Hearing Rooms, 7120 Amigo Street, Las Vegas, NV.

SB80, SB91 (WS) , SB180
3:30 PM
  • Room 2134 of the Legislative Building, 401 South Carson Street, Carson City, NV.
  • Videoconferenced to Room 4 of the Nevada Legislature Hearing Rooms, 7120 Amigo Street, Las Vegas, NV.

4:00 PM

No meeting scheduled - no agenda available.
  
Friday, May 9, 2025

8:00 AM
  • Room 4100 of the Legislative Building, 401 South Carson Street, Carson City, NV.
  • Videoconferenced to Room 6 of the Nevada Legislature Hearing Rooms, 7120 Amigo Street, Las Vegas, NV.
1:00 PM
  • Room 1214 of the Legislative Building, 401 South Carson Street, Carson City, NV.
  • Videoconferenced to Room 6 of the Nevada Legislature Hearing Rooms, 7120 Amigo Street, Las Vegas, NV.

  
Wednesday, June 18, 2025

9:00 AM

  • Room 165 of the Nevada Legislature Office Building, 7230 Amigo Street, Las Vegas, NV 89119
  • Videoconferenced to Room 4100 of the Legislative Building, 401 South Carson Street, Carson City, NV.
This is the third meeting in calendar year 2025. The agenda is not yet available.
  
Friday, June 20, 2025

8:00 AM

Nevada Girls State
  • The Assembly Chamber of the Legislative Building, 401 South Carson Street, Carson City, NV.