SB374
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 18, 2013.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Segerblom, Hutchison, Manendo, Aizley, Hogan, Swank

Provides for the registration of medical marijuana establishments authorized to cultivate or dispense marijuana or manufacture edible marijuana products or marijuana-infused products for sale to persons authorized to engage in the medical use of marijuana. (BDR 15-89)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: Increases or Newly Provides for Term of Imprisonment in County or City Jail or Detention Facility.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 547.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Judiciary     Mar 29, 2013     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Judiciary     Apr 11, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Finance     May 16, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Finance     May 23, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Judiciary     Jun 01, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Judiciary     Jun 02, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 29, 2013   Yea 17,   Nay 4,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (3rd Reprint)       Jun 03, 2013   Yea 26,   Nay 16,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (3rd Reprint)       Jun 03, 2013   Yea 28,   Nay 14,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    3rd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 333     Amend. No. 849     Amend. No. 961   

Bill History

Mar 18, 2013

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Mar 20, 2013

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 04, 2013

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 22, 2013

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 333.)
  • Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.

Apr 23, 2013

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Exemption effective.
  • To committee.

May 28, 2013

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 849.) To printer.

May 29, 2013

May 30, 2013

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

Jun 02, 2013

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 961.) To printer.

Jun 03, 2013

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint .
  • Read third time. Lost. (Yeas: 26, Nays: 16.)
  • Action reconsidered.
  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.
  • Taken from Chief Clerk's desk.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 28, Nays: 14.) To Senate.
  • In Senate.
  • Assembly Amendment No. 961 concurred in. To enrollment.

Jun 06, 2013

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 12, 2013

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 547.
  • Sections 25.5 and 26 of this act become effective upon passage and approval. Sections 1 to 22, inclusive, 22.35 to 24.7, inclusive, and 25 of this act become effective June 12, 2013, for the purpose of adopting regulations and carrying out other preparatory administrative acts, and on April 1, 2014, for all other purposes. Sections 22.3 and 24.9 of this act become effective on April 1, 2016. Sections 14 and 15 of this act expire by limitation on the date on which the provisions of 42 U.S.C. § 666 requiring each state to establish procedures under which the state has authority to withhold or suspend, or to restrict the use of professional, occupational and recreational licenses of persons who: (a) Have failed to comply with a subpoena or warrant relating to a proceeding to determine the paternity of a child or to establish or enforce an obligation for the support of a child; or (b) Are in arrears in the payment for the support of one or more children, are repealed by the Congress of the United States.