AB354
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 18, 2013.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Diaz, Bobzien, Pierce, Swank

Prohibits the manufacture, sale or distribution of certain consumer products that contain or come in direct physical contact with Bisphenol A. (BDR 52-789)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 203.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr 03, 2013     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr 12, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     May 08, 2013     12:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     May 13, 2013     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 22, 2013   Yea 39,   Nay 0,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0,  Vacant 1
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 22, 2013   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 472   

Bill History

Mar 18, 2013

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Mar 20, 2013

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 01, 2013

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 18, 2013

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 472.) To printer.

Apr 19, 2013

Apr 22, 2013

Apr 23, 2013

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To committee.

May 18, 2013

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

May 20, 2013

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 21, 2013

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 22, 2013

May 23, 2013

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

May 27, 2013

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 28, 2013

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 203.
  • Sections 1, 2, and 4 of this act effective January 1, 2014. Section 3 of this act effective July 1, 2014.