SB313
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 18, 2013.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Denis

Revises provisions relating to autonomous vehicles. (BDR 43-954)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Chapter 377.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Transportation     Mar 27, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Transportation     Apr 08, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Not Heard
  Senate Transportation     Apr 10, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Transportation     May 07, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Transportation     May 16, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Transportation     May 29, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Concur

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 18, 2013   Yea 20,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 23, 2013   Yea 39,   Nay 1,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 239     Amend. No. 698   

Bill History

Mar 18, 2013

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To printer.

Mar 20, 2013

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 16, 2013

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 17, 2013

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 239.) To printer.

Apr 18, 2013

Apr 22, 2013

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To committee.

May 22, 2013

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 698.) To printer.

May 23, 2013

May 24, 2013

  • In Senate.

May 30, 2013

  • Assembly Amendment No. 698 concurred in. To enrollment.

Jun 01, 2013

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 02, 2013

  • Approved by the Governor.
  • Chapter 377.
  • Effective July 1, 2013.