SB221
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 07, 2013.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Jones, Ford, Kihuen, Segerblom, Spearman

Makes certain changes relating to public safety. (BDR 14-943)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Vetoed by the Governor.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Health and Human Services     Mar 14, 2013     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Judiciary     Mar 25, 2013     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned No Jurisdiction
  Senate Health and Human Services     Apr 11, 2013     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Finance     May 06, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Finance     May 21, 2013     10:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Judiciary     May 28, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Senate Finance     May 28, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned No Jurisdiction
  Assembly Judiciary     Jun 03, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 22, 2013   Yea 11,   Nay 10,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       Jun 03, 2013   Yea 23,   Nay 19,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Proposed Amendments     Amend. No. 809   
Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 362     Amend. No. 815   
Other Amendments   
(see bill history below or search the journals)
 Amend. No. 820   

Bill History

Mar 07, 2013

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Mar 08, 2013

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 22, 2013

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 362.)
  • Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.

Apr 23, 2013

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Exemption effective.
  • To committee.

May 21, 2013

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk.
  • Taken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 815.) To printer.

May 22, 2013

May 23, 2013

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

Jun 03, 2013

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 23, Nays: 19.) To Senate.
  • In Senate. To enrollment.

Jun 06, 2013

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 13, 2013

  • Vetoed by the Governor.