SB140
Introduced in the Senate on Feb 10, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Breeden, Schneider, Manendo, Parks, Denis, Copening, Horsford, Wiener, Segerblom, Atkinson, Munford, Smith

Prohibits the use of a cellular telephone or other handheld wireless communications device while operating a motor vehicle in certain circumstances. (BDR 43-45)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 523.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Transportation     Feb 22, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Transportation     Mar 08, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Transportation     Mar 17, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Transportation     May 12, 2011     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Transportation     May 19, 2011     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 26, 2011   Yea 12,   Nay 9,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (3rd Reprint)       May 30, 2011   Yea 24,   Nay 17,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    3rd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 99     Amend. No. 483     Amend. No. 670     Amend. No. 809   

Bill History

Feb 10, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To printer.

Feb 11, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 18, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 19, 2011

  • Taken from Second Reading File. Placed on Second Reading File for next legislative day.

Apr 20, 2011

  • Taken from Second Reading File. Placed on Second Reading File for next legislative day.

Apr 22, 2011

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. Nos. 99 and 483.) To printer.

Apr 25, 2011

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 26, 2011

Apr 27, 2011

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To committee.

May 26, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 670.) To printer.

May 27, 2011

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.

May 29, 2011

  • Taken from Chief Clerk's desk.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 809.) To printer.

May 30, 2011

Jun 02, 2011

  • In Senate.

Jun 04, 2011

  • Assembly Amendment Nos. 670 and 809 concurred in. To enrollment.

Jun 09, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 17, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 523.
  • Effective October 1, 2011.