SB75
Introduced in the Senate on Dec 15, 2010.
By: Select Committee on Economic Growth and Employment

Establishes a program to provide private equity funding to businesses engaged in certain industries in this State. (BDR 31-523)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 423.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Select Committee on Economic Growth and Employment     Feb 09, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Senate Select Committee on Economic Growth and Employment     Mar 07, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Assembly Ways and Means     Apr 04, 2011     08:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned, no jurisdiction
  Senate Select Committee on Economic Growth and Employment     Apr 06, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Select Committee on Economic Growth and Employment     Apr 15, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Senate Finance     Apr 30, 2011     10:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Senate Select Committee on Economic Growth and Employment     May 06, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     May 26, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Assembly Government Affairs     May 27, 2011     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Government Affairs     Jun 04, 2011     08:45 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 18, 2011   Yea 12,   Nay 9,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 18, 2011   Yea 13,   Nay 8,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (3rd Reprint)       Jun 06, 2011   Yea 28,   Nay 14,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    3rd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 566     Amend. No. 575     Amend. No. 945   

Bill History

Dec 15, 2010

  • Prefiled. Referred to Select Committee on Economic Growth and Employment. To printer.

Dec 17, 2010

  • From printer.

Feb 07, 2011

  • Read first time. To committee.

Mar 04, 2011

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 18, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.

Apr 19, 2011

  • Taken from Second Reading File.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Finance. To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

May 02, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 04, 2011

  • Read second time.

May 07, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 09, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 10, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 11, 2011

  • Read third time. Amendment No. 565 failed.
  • Amended. (Amend. No. 566.)
  • Action reconsidered on Amend. No. 565.
  • To printer.

May 12, 2011

May 13, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 14, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 16, 2011

  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 575.) To printer.

May 17, 2011

May 18, 2011

May 19, 2011

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.

Jun 06, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 945.)
  • Dispensed with reprinting.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. Preamble adopted. (Yeas: 28, Nays: 14.)
  • To printer.
  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint .
  • To Senate.
  • In Senate.
  • Assembly Amendment No. 945 concurred in. To enrollment.

Jun 13, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 16, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 423.
  • Effective October 1, 2011.