2013-2014 Interim
Task Force on K-12 Public Education Funding Technical Advisory Committee (S.B. 500, 2013)

Agendas and Minutes

Sign up to Receive Committee Information

March 31, 2014 Meeting

April 21, 2014 Meeting

May 8, 2014 Meeting

May 21, 2014 Meeting

June 5, 2014 Meeting