2013-2014 Interim
Sunset Subcommittee of the Legislative Commission (NRS 232B.210)

Agendas and Minutes

Sign up to Receive Committee Information

February 3, 2014 Meeting

March 4, 2014 Meeting

April 8, 2014 Meeting

May 6, 2014 Meeting

June 4, 2014 Meeting

Work Session Document With Exhibits - April 8, 2014 Meeting

Work Session Document With Exhibits - May 6, 2014, Meeting

Work Session Document With Exhibits - June 4, 2014, Meeting

Revised Work Session Document With Exhibits - June 4, 2014, Meeting

Sunset Subcommittee Review Form

Instructions for Completion of Sunset Subcommittee Review Form

Boards, Commissions, and Similar Entities

Boards, Commissions, and Similar Entities - Appears to be Inactive