2013-2014 Interim
Committee on Industrial Programs (NRS 209.4817)

Summary 
The Committee on Industrial Programs is an ongoing statutory committee consisting of the Director of the Department of Corrections, the Chief of the Purchasing Division of the Department of Administration and eight regular members appointed by the Legislative Interim Finance Committee. The primary responsibilities of the Committee are set forth in Nevada Revised Statutes 209.4818. These responsibilities include a review of the operations of current and proposed industrial programs for correctional institutions within the Department of Corrections and to report to the Interim Finance Committee semiannually on the status of those programs.

Agendas and Minutes

Sign up to Receive Committee Information

September 20, 2013 Meeting

November 22, 2013 Meeting

March 28, 2014 Meeting

June 27, 2014 Meeting

September 12, 2014 Meeting **MEETING CANCELLED** Will be rescheduled at a later date.